EventRestrooms.com LP v. Entergy Services Inc

Case Number: 4:2010cv00153
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: O Office
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: O

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 54 Motion to Compel Post-Judgment Discovery; pltf must provide complete responses to deft's post-judgment discovery requests on or before 2/24/11. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/14/11. (vjt)
September 27, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees pursuant to 52 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Entergy Services Inc against EventRestrooms.com LP for attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $87,004.90 plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.25% per annum. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/27/10. (vjt)
August 30, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 48 Amended Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Entergy Services Inc on its counterclaim against EventRestrooms.com LP in the amount of $418,739.57, plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.26% per annum; pltf's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/30/10. (vjt)
August 4, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW finding in favor of Entergy Services, Inc. on the claims of Eventrestrooms.com, L.P. and on Entergy's counterclaim; directing Entergy to submit a brief on pre-judgment issues within 14 days from the entry of these findings, with Event's response being due 7 days after Entergy files its brief. A judgment in the amount of $379,249.16, plus recoverable interest, will be entered separately, after the parties have briefed the issues relating to pre-judgment interest. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/4/10. (bkp)
August 2, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Michael D. Snell, pltf's counsel, and David D. Wilson and William Webster Darling, II, counsel for deft, to bring electronic devices into the courthouse, between August 2, 2010, and August 3, 2010, subject to the provisions of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/2/10. (vjt)
March 8, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Joint MOTION to Transfer to Little Rock Division. The Clerk is directed to transfer this action from the docket of the Jonesboro Division to the docket of the Western Division. After the transfer, the Court will issue a new scheduling order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/8/2010. (DOCKET NOTE: The new Case No. is 4:10CV00153-JLH.) (jct)
February 10, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing 2/8/10 bench trial due to inclement weather. A new trial date will be set by separate Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/10/2010. (jct)
January 21, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, ( Bench Trial before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes set for the week of 2/8/2010 is rescheduled to begin at 1:30 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 ). Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/21/2010. (jct)
September 14, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, ( Bench Trial before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes rescheduled for the week of 2/8/2010 at 9:15 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 ). If counsel wish to bring electronic devices to the Courthouse, please note Amended General Order No. 54. T he discovery & motions deadlines have passed. Any revisions to the trial briefs & proposed findings & conclusions of law previously submitted by the parties, should be submitted no later 1/29/2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/14/09. (jct)
September 2, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Entergy's Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion is GRANTED as to the Plaintiff's quantum meruit claim and DENIED as to the Plaintiff's breach of contract claim & Entergy's breach of contract counterclaim. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/2/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EventRestrooms.com LP v. Entergy Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?