Boehm v. Eli Lilly & Company et al

Plaintiff: Timothy Boehm
Defendant: Eli Lilly & Company and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2010cv00159
Filed: March 12, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2013 125 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 124 Order dismissing plaintiff's claims with prejudice, except counts II and VII, which are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/5/13. (kpr)
January 3, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss all the Doe defts without prejudice and to term them as parties. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/3/12. (kpr)
December 20, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion to Compel; granting 49 Motion to Compel, as modified; and granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/20/11. (kpr)
May 21, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 13 Motion for Limited Admission by Sidney W. Jackson III; Mr. Jackson must register with CM/ECF in the Eastern District of Arkansas by June 4, 2010. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/21/2010. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boehm v. Eli Lilly & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Boehm
Represented By: Sidney W. Jackson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly & Company
Represented By: Nina M. Gussack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?