Gatewood v. Little Rock National Airport

Plaintiff: Victor L Gatewood
Defendant: Little Rock National Airport
Case Number: 4:2010cv00189
Filed: March 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 42 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice; as a condition to refiling this action, pltf must pay all reasonable costs incurred by deft to date, including attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/18/11. (vjt)
February 15, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice deft's 32 Motion to Dismiss, and grants in part deft's 32 Motion for Sanctions; pltf is given 20 days from the entry of this Order to respond to deft's discovery requests, and to pay deft's costs of $131.70 for securing a court reporter; pltf is ordered to appear for any deposition that deft may schedule; Discovery deadline is extended to 3/15/2011. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/15/11. (vjt)
July 22, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve deft. with the summons, original and amended complaints pursuant to Rule 4 of the FRCP. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/22/10. (bkp)
March 29, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pro se pltf to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; the Clerk is directed to serve this Order on pltf by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/29/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gatewood v. Little Rock National Airport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor L Gatewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock National Airport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?