Springer et al v. Welspun Pipes Inc

Plaintiff: Lisa Springer and Crystal Daniels
Defendant: Welspun Pipes Inc
Case Number: 4:2010cv00252
Filed: April 20, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 41 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Welspun Pipes Inc dismissing the complaint of Crystal N Daniels and Lisa Springer with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/29/11. (vjt)
February 7, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Elizabeth R. Cummings and Sheila Johnson to bring electronic devices into the courthouse in Little Rock, between 2/14/11 and 2/17/11, subject to the rules stated in this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/7/11. (vjt)
January 27, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying deft's 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/27/11. (vjt)
November 22, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 19 Motion to Extend Deadline for filing motions for summary judgment; Motions due by 1/5/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/22/10. (vjt)
November 17, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Discovery due 12/16/10. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/17/10. (vjt)
November 4, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/4/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Springer et al v. Welspun Pipes Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Springer
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Daniels
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welspun Pipes Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?