Gibbs et al v. PrimeLending et al

Plaintiff: Mark Gibbs and Karla Gibbs
Defendant: PrimeLending, Stewart Title Company, eLender Services LLC, eLender Escrow Inc, Netco Inc, Shelley A Hickson, Lawyers Title of Nevada Inc, Amy Christine Tueckes, Corinthian Title Company Inc, Commonwealth Land Title Company, Mark Russell, Russell Biszantz, Netco Title Inc, Stephanie R Drye and Jeffery H Brow
Case Number: 4:2010cv00293
Filed: April 23, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2013 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the four defendants to pay an aggregate total of $650,000 to U S Bank National Association ND by paying their respective shares into the registry of the Court. Each party's check must be made payable to "Clerk, United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas," and must reference both case numbers. The Clerk is directed to accept these funds for deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 1/18/13. (kpr)
June 8, 2012 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 152 Motion to Dismiss Cross Complaint. The claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/8/12. (kpr)
March 23, 2012 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 136 Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint against Amy Tueckes, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/23/12. (kpr)
August 4, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION ARKANSAS SUPREME COURT re 92 Certification of Issue to State Court, 96 Per Curiam Order. CERTIFIED QUESTION ANSWERED. Opinion delivered June 16, 2011, by Jim Hannah, Chief Justice. (kpr)
July 12, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign case no. 4:11cv00123 to this Court by chip exchange and granting 99 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/12/11. (kpr)
December 17, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court PER CURIAM ORDER re: notice of acceptance of certification from Supreme Court of Arkansas re 92 Certification of Issue to State Court. Petitioners' brief is due 30 days from the date of this per curiam order. Respondent's brief is due 30 days thereafter; and Petitioners may file their reply within 15 days thereafter. (bkp)
December 2, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATION ORDER, purs to Rule 6-8 of the Rules of the Supreme Court of the State of Arkansas, this Court certifies to the Supreme Court of Arkansas a question of law that may be determinative of this case. The Clerk is hereby directed to forward this Order to the Supreme Court of Arkansas under his official seal.. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/2/10. (bkp)
October 14, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defts' 36 Motions 38 50 16 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/14/10. (bkp)
July 27, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Stay Scheduling ORder ddls for the Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) until the Court has ruled on the pending motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/27/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs et al v. PrimeLending et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Gibbs
Represented By: Donald K. Campbell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Gibbs
Represented By: Donald K. Campbell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PrimeLending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eLender Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eLender Escrow Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley A Hickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawyers Title of Nevada Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Christine Tueckes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corinthian Title Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Land Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Biszantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netco Title Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie R Drye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery H Brow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?