Wright v. St Vincent Infirmary Medical Center

Plaintiff: Janice Wright
Defendant: St Vincent Infirmary Medical Center
Case Number: 4:2010cv00296
Filed: April 23, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of St Vincent Health System against Janice Wright. The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/21/12. (kpr)
August 13, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Sarah Colley and Debbie Hawthorne- St. Vincent's representatives-may bring their cell phones (including smart phones) into the courthouse on August 16th and 17th pursuant to the stated policy. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 08/13/2012. (jak)
May 18, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to confer on a trial date and file a joint report on their preference by June 1, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/18/12. (kpr)
May 13, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information 17 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/13/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. St Vincent Infirmary Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Wright
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Vincent Infirmary Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?