King v. Green et al

Plaintiff: Robert King
Defendant: Bobby Green, Dyers, Jackson, Charles Holladay, Johnson, Meadows, R Tensley and Nelson
Case Number: 4:2010cv00312
Filed: April 28, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2012 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carl Johnson; pltf's claims against Johnson are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Carl Johnson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/12/12. (vjt)
July 10, 2012 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to return pltf's letter without filing it, as pltf is represented by counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/10/12. (vjt)
April 25, 2012 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 214 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against deft Smith are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; pltf's 213 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss his claims against deft Hamilton is GRANTED; the claims against Hamilton are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Barbara Hamilton and Margaret Elaine Smith terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/12. (vjt)
April 11, 2012 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re documents submitted by pltf for filing, the Clerk is directed to return the documents to pltf, without filing them; if pltf wishes to pursue new claims against additional defts, he may do so in a new lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 4/11/12. (vjt)
February 3, 2012 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Margaret Elaine Smith (originally sued as M E Smith); the Clerk is directed to place Under Seal pltf's 210 Notice of Smith's address; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaints 6 130 , and this Order upon Smith (ADDRESS FILED UNDER SEAL), without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/3/12. (vjt)
November 15, 2011 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward pltf's letter re certain video and documentary evidence to his appointed counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/15/11. (vjt)
September 22, 2011 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all of pltf's proposed witnesses 121 are denied; the ADC is directed to ensure pltf's attendance, along with his institutional and medical records at the hearing scheduled for 10/17/11 in Little Rock. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/22/11. (vjt)
August 17, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Carl Johnson (originally sued as Johnson); the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, substituted complaint 6 , and this Order on defts Johnson and Green (ADDRESSES FILED UNDER SEAL), without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 8/17/10. (vjt)
August 16, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, substituted complaint 6 , and this Order on deft Jackson (ADDRESS FILED UNDER SEAL), without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 8/16/10. (vjt)
July 21, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S.Marshal to serve a copy of the substituted complaint, this order and summons upon defts without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/21/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Green et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Tensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?