B&B Hardware Inc v. Fastenal Company

Plaintiff: B&B Hardware Inc
Defendant: Fastenal Company
Case Number: 4:2010cv00317
Filed: May 3, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2011 111 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Fastenal Company against B&B Hardware Inc re 110 Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/24/11. (kpr)
August 1, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 107 Motion to Seal Document. The Clerk is directed to file under seal Fastenal's Reply Brief in Further Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment, together with any exhibits or other related materials. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/1/11. (kpr)
June 28, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Appointing John C. Everett as a Special Master under Fed.R.Civ. P.53. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/28/11. (kpr)
June 21, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re telephone conference to be held at 1:15 p.m., Thursday, June 23, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/21/11. (kpr)
May 25, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying docket entry # 63 B&B Hardware, Inc.'s Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/25/2011. (ksm)
May 24, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties are hereby ordered NOT to file any further pleadings concerning the B&B Hardware Inc.'s MOTION to Compel, docket entry # 63 . Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/24/2011. (ksm)
April 22, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/22/11. (kpr)
April 5, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER postponing all depositions scheduled during April 2011 until after May 2, 2011; and directing the parties to complete their document production no later than May 2, 2011. The Court will hold a telephone conference, if necessary, on May 9, 2011, at 1:30 p.m. to address issues including the scheduling of depositions and addtl discovery ddls. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/5/11. (kpr)
March 31, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the depositions scheduled for April 5, 6 and 7 in Winona, MN will proceed; ordering pltf B&B Hardware, Inc. to provide documents as set forth in this Order by 3 p.m. on March 31, 2011. Fastenal must notify the Court and B&B Hardware by 10 a.m. on April 1, 2011, if it believes any documents were wrongfully withheld. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/31/11. (kpr)
March 3, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Summary Judgment and lifting t he stay of discovery. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/3/11. (kpr)
February 16, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion to Stay Discovery pending resolution of motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/16/11. (bkp)
January 19, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED EXPERT DISCLOSURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/19/11. (bkp)
August 16, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/16/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B&B Hardware Inc v. Fastenal Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&B Hardware Inc
Represented By: Sean R. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fastenal Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?