Rivercliff Company Inc v. Residences At Riverdale GP LLC et al

Plaintiff: Rivercliff Company Inc
Defendant: Residences At Riverdale GP LLC, Residences At Riverdale LP, Nations Construction and David F Stapleton
Case Number: 4:2010cv00330
Filed: May 7, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that cases 4:10CV00330 and 4:11CV00748 are hereby consolidated for the purpose of trial only; the cases will not merge into a single action, and the parties should continue to make filings in the separate cases. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/24/12. (vjt)
February 8, 2012 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties have up to and including 10 days from the entry of this Order to file any objections or concerns regarding the proposed consolidation of a joint trial in cases 4:10CV00330 and 4:11CV00748. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/8/12. (vjt)
February 6, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defts' 93 Motion to Strike the expert report and exclude the testimony of Dr. Norman D. Dennis; granting pltf's 97 Motion for Leave to provide belated expert witness disclosure. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/6/12. (vjt)
December 12, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/12/11. (vjt)
December 2, 2011 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 32 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses; the parties are directed to submit an agreed protective order within five days from the entry of this Order; denying pltf's 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying defts� 39; 46 Motion in Limine; denying defts' 48 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Punitive Damages; granting deft Nations' 49 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Punitive Damages; denying defts' 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying defts' 80 Joint Motion to Strike Affidavit Testimony. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/2/11. (vjt)
September 27, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Intervene by Transcriptions Inc; granting the intervenor's 37 Motion to Quash on the ground that the subpoena at issue is unduly burdensome. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/27/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivercliff Company Inc v. Residences At Riverdale GP LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rivercliff Company Inc
Represented By: Christian Campbell Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residences At Riverdale GP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residences At Riverdale LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nations Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David F Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?