Creasman v. Dish Network LCC et al

Plaintiff: William P Creasman
Defendant: Dish Network LCC, Dish DBS Corporation and Dish Network Corporation
Case Number: 4:2010cv00392
Filed: May 12, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 40 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order dismissing the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/29/11. (kpr)
March 28, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 15 Motion to Strike; and dismissing plaintiff's complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/28/11. (kpr)
March 17, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 38 Stipulation for Extension of Ddls to Conduct Class Certification Discovery and File Class Certifications Papers and amending the class action-related ddls, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/17/11. (kpr)
March 7, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 MOTION for Garry T. Stevens, Jr., to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for pltf in this matter. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/7/11. (vjt)
January 7, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Zuzuna S. Ikels for deft. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/7/11. (bkp)
June 15, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Olimpio Lee Squitieri to Appear pro hac vice as additional counsel for pltf in this matter. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/15/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creasman v. Dish Network LCC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William P Creasman
Represented By: George Randy Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dish Network LCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dish DBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dish Network Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?