Tucker v. Briarwood Nursing and Rehab et al

Plaintiff: Rose K Tucker
Defendant: Briarwood Nursing and Rehab and Joan Robbins
Case Number: 4:2010cv00400
Filed: May 14, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 48 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Briarwood Nursing and Rehab dismissing the complaint of Rose K Tucker with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/24/11. (vjt)
October 13, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file a response to 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Briarwood Nursing and Rehab on or before 10/20/11. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/13/11. (vjt)
March 21, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing parties to file a Status Report no later than Friday, April 1, 2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/21/11. (vjt)
July 27, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Kristopher B. Knox to represent plaintiff in all further proceedings; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send plaintiff and counsel a copy of this Order and a copy of Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/27/10. (bkp)
July 26, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel, counsel to be appointed by a separate order; and granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/26/10. (bkp)
May 19, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pro se plaintiff to be familiar and comply with all the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as well as the Local Rules of this Court; and directing the Clerk to serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/19/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Briarwood Nursing and Rehab et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose K Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briarwood Nursing and Rehab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?