Cockrill v. Baptist Health et al

Plaintiff: Todd Cockrill
Defendant: Baptist Health, Abdalla Tahiri, Patricia Vickers and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2010cv00524
Filed: May 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Proceeds. The settlement of $950,000 received by the Estate of Betty J. Whatley should be distributed as set forth in this Order. The Clerk should make the checks payable to each individual party and mail the checks to the law offices of Thomas & Hickey, L.L.P., 423 North Washington Avenue, El Dorado, AR 71730. Mr. Thomas is ordered to make certain the checks are forwarded to each party. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/4/12. (kpr)
March 5, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to receive money in this case and deposit it into an interest bearing account until this Court approves its distribution. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/5/12. (kpr)
February 17, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 74 Joint MOTION for Settlement Motion to Confirm Settlement, to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Abdalla Tahiri, M.D. and Baptist Health d/b/a Baptist Health Medical Centers and to Deposit Settlement Proceeds into Registry of Court Pending Judicial Determin filed by Janice Cockrill. A hearing is set on the approval of the settlement and for the distribution of proceeds at 10:00 a.m., Thursday, March 29, 2012, in Courtroom A403 of the U. S. Courthouse, 600 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, AR. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/17/12. (kpr)
August 9, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed filed by Patricia Vickers. Plaintiff is directed to file a response by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, August 12, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/9/11. (kpr)
March 16, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/16/11. (kpr)
March 7, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER directing pltf to file a response to 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Patricia Vickers by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, March 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/7/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cockrill v. Baptist Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Health
Represented By: Laura Hensley Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdalla Tahiri
Represented By: Rick T. Beard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Vickers
Represented By: Scott D. Provencher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Cockrill
Represented By: Floyd M. Thomas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?