Stacks v. Bluejay Holdings LLC et al

Plaintiff: John B Stacks
Defendant: Bluejay Holdings LLC, Ten X Holdings LLC, Richard F Beston, Jr, John W Branch and Jason Maples
Case Number: 4:2010cv00718
Filed: June 22, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Van Buren
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2011 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 136 Stipulation for Dismissal, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/21/11. (vjt)
August 9, 2011 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 132 133 Notices of Appearance, Charles Davidson and Stephen Gershner are hereby substituted as counsel of record for John Stacks in place of John Everett; Attorney John C. Everett terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/9/11. (vjt)
June 23, 2011 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the hearing held this day, the motions to confirm a settlement and to dismiss the case with prejudice are denied 108 109 110 ; the motions to dismiss the counterclaim are denied as moot 89 98 ; the motion of Jason Maples to withdraw his appearance and for a continuance is granted 100 ; David B. Vandergriff shall represent Maples in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/23/11. (vjt)
April 18, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 MOTION for John W. Branch to Appear Pro Hac Vice to represent Ten X Holdings, LLC and Bluejay Holdings, LLC; and MOTION to Substitute John W. Branch as counsel of record for Ten X Holdings, LLC and Bluejay Holdings, LLC in place of Floyd M. Thomas, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/18/11. (vjt)
April 12, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER, for the reasons stated in the Court's previous Opinion and Order 76 , the motions to dismiss are GRANTED as to Count I and DENIED as to Counts II through VI 79 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/12/11. (vjt)
April 1, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that the motions to dismiss are GRANTED with respect to Count I and DENIED with respect to Counts II through VI 69 71 73 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/1/11. (vjt)
March 28, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Amended Complaint; Bluejay Holdings LLC, and Ten X Holdings LLC answer due 4/1/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/28/11. (vjt)
February 28, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the motions to vacate and set aside are denied as moot 37 38 39 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/28/11. (vjt)
February 7, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 16 MOTION of Floyd M. Thomas, Jr. to Withdraw as Counsel of Record is denied as to corporate defts Bluejay Holdings LLC, and Ten X Holdings LLC, and is granted as to individual defts John W Branch, Richard F Beston, Jr, and Jason Maples; the Clerk is directed to serve this Order on pro se defts Beston, Branch, and Maples by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/7/11. (vjt)
September 29, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that defts' 6 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with respect to Count I of the complaint and DENIED as to Counts II through V; Count I of the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/29/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stacks v. Bluejay Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John B Stacks
Represented By: John C. Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluejay Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ten X Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard F Beston, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?