YXRAY GmbH v. Welspun Tubular LLC

Plaintiff: YXRAY GmbH
Defendant: Welspun Tubular LLC
Case Number: 4:2010cv00722
Filed: June 22, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of Country
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: YXRAY' s claims and Welspun's counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the parties' settlement agreement. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/25/2012. (dmn)
August 13, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting J. Andrew Vines's 59 motion to withdraw as YXRAY's attorney. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 08/13/2012. (jak)
June 8, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to request a settlement conference before Judge Deere, if they wish to try and resolve their differences. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/8/12. (kpr)
December 16, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion in Limine; denying 39 Motion in Limine; denying 41 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/16/11. (kpr)
August 22, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 9/1/2011 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # B-155 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Expedited response to the motion for leave, document number 41, due by August 26, 2011; reply due by August 30, 2011. The Court requests the parties to address QHG of Springdale, Inc. v. Archer, 2009 Ark. App. 692 (en banc). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/22/11. (kpr)
July 21, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Amanda Wofford, counsel for Welspun, to bring electronic equipment into the courthouse for a hearing scheduled for 7/21/2011 in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/21/2011. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YXRAY GmbH v. Welspun Tubular LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YXRAY GmbH
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welspun Tubular LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?