Covington v. Crawford & Company

Plaintiff: Crystal Covington
Defendant: Crawford & Company
Case Number: 4:2010cv00729
Filed: June 24, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 59 Memorandum and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/24/11. (vjt)
July 25, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 51 Motion to Set Pretrial Conference and 52 Motion to Compel Response to Discovery. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/25/11. (vjt)
May 6, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 43 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline; Discovery due by 6/30/2011. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/6/11. (vjt)
February 23, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING from the record 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint as it was not filed by an attorney properly appearing in this Court; extending the deadline for filing motions to amend the pleadings (including the complaint) to and including 3/21/11. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/23/11. (vjt)
September 17, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Reconsideration re 7 Order denying Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/17/10. (bkp)
June 28, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pro se pltf to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; the Clerk is directed to serve this Order on pltf by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/28/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covington v. Crawford & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?