Tucker v. Buckman et al

Plaintiff: Troy Allen Tucker
Defendant: Joseph Buckman, Pulaski County Detention Facility, Williams, James, Cobbs and Rectenwald
Case Number: 4:2010cv00749
Filed: June 30, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2012 174 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defendants re 173 Memorandum and Order dismissing the case and denying the relief sought. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/20/12. (kpr)
August 20, 2012 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 135 Motion for Costs. The Clerk is directed to distribute to the named applicant the amount of $1971.65. A copy of this Order, together with the application, shall be placed in the Fund file maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/20/12. (kpr) (Docket text modified on 8/20/2012 to correct the amount.) (thd).
April 11, 2012 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 115 Motion for Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/11/12. (kpr)
September 30, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 MOTION of Frederick S. Wetzel, III to Withdraw as appointed counsel for pltf; appointing David Lawrence Ivers to represent pltf in all further proceedings in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/30/11. (vjt)
September 16, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Lawrence E. Chisenhall to represent plaintiff in all further proceedings in this action. The Clerk is directed to send counsel and plaintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/16/11. (kpr)
August 9, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the August 23, 2011 Pre-Jury Hearing in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/9/11. (kpr)
November 1, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve defts Carl Johnson and Rhonda Anderson at the addresses provided under seal without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/1/10. (bkp)
September 22, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney's proposed findings and recommendations; directing Plaintiff to proceed with his claims against Defendants Doc Holiday, Carl Johnson, Mrs. C. Smith, Nurse Anderson, and Nurse Washburn; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare a summons for the Defendants and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the 8 Amended Complaint, summons, this Partial Recommendation, and any Order adopting this Partial Recommendation upon Defendants wit hout prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore; dimsissing Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Pulaski County Detention Facility, Wright, and Lacking for failure to state a claim; and dismissing all remaining claims and Defendants, without prejudice, so that the Plaintiff may pursue them, if he so chooses, in a separately filed action. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 9/22/10. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Buckman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Allen Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Buckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rectenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?