Marshall v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al

Plaintiff: Theresa Marshall
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 4:2010cv00754
Filed: June 30, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER AND JUDGMENT AMENDING 22 Order 15 Order 23 Judgment to dismiss with prejudice all of plaintiff's claims, and defts are dismissed with prejudice as parties to this action. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/3/11. (bkp)
February 1, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 22 Order dismissing defts Wells Fargo and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company without prejudice and dismissing plaintiff's claims without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/1/11. (bkp)
December 29, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER lifting the Stay on the 15 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, and limiting discovery efforts to Plaintiff's claim that notice required by the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act was insufficient or improper if the debt was disputed, and to Plaintiff's claims brought under the Arkansas Deceptive Trade Practices Act. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/29/10. (bkp)
December 9, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Stay Discovery pending a decision on defts' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/9/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Marshall
Represented By: Stephen B. Niswanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Blair Beavers Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Blair Beavers Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?