Metropolitan National Bank v. Harvey et al

Plaintiff: Metropolitan National Bank
Defendant: Edward M Harvey and Bonnie P Harvey
Case Number: 4:2010cv00767
Filed: July 6, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, the Court having been informed that a settlement has been reached in this matter, hereby dismisses this action with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/19/11. (vjt)
April 19, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines; Discovery due by 5/15/2011; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 5/6/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/19/11. (vjt)
March 25, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline; Discovery due by 4/30/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/25/11. (vjt)
March 15, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's 43 Motion to Compel Production of Certain Documents is denied as moot without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/15/11. (vjt)
February 28, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Discovery due by 3/30/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/28/11. (vjt)
February 22, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Move for Leave to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings; Amended Pleadings due by 3/8/2011; all other deadlines remain in effect. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/22/11. (vjt)
August 19, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and directing plaintiff to file its amended complaint within seven days from the entry of this Order; and granting 19 Motion to Compel and ordering Bonnie P. Harvey to attend the hearing scheduled to begin at 9:30 a.m. on Friday, August 20, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/19/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan National Bank v. Harvey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan National Bank
Represented By: Philip S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward M Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie P Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?