Miller v. USA et al

Plaintiff: Sharon K Miller
Defendant: USA and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 4:2010cv00796
Filed: July 7, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The United States' Unopposed Motion to Amend Judgment 95 is GRANTED. Judgment is entered in favor of the United States of America and against Ron Turner in the amount of $540,761.48 plus interest accruing after April 30, 2013 pursuant to law until paid. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/29/2013. (dmn)
March 29, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT entered in favor of United States of America and the Internal Revenue Service as to claims against A. Ronald Turner. Judgment is entered in favor of Terry G. Whittington as to the claims made against him by United States of America and the Internal Revenue Service. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/29/2013. (dmn)
August 29, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Modify the Final Scheduling Order filed by USA. The ddl for response to the motion for summary judgment is 9/7/12 for non-moving parties. The reply ddl for the U.S. is 9/28/12. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/29/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon K Miller
Represented By: Douglas W. Coy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?