Johnson v. Holiday et al

Plaintiff: Julius Johnson
Defendant: Doc Holiday, Anderson, Greer and Does
Case Number: 4:2010cv00905
Filed: July 13, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 118 Order, judgment is entered dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/21/2011. (kdr)
March 2, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 86 Partial Report and Recommendations granting 83 Motion to Dismiss Party and dismissing pltf's claims against deft Nancy Brawley without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/2/11. (kpr)
November 19, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Nancy Brawley (originally sued as Brawley). Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/19/10. (vjt)
November 18, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court will treat 45 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rhonda Anderson and 49 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Maxim Health Care Services Inc as Motions for Summary Judgment; defts are therefore directed to file statements of facts no later than 14 days after the entry of this Order; pltf's response is due no later than 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/18/10. (vjt)
October 29, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to Amend; directing the Clerk to add as Defendants Maxim Health Care Services and Sgt. Brawley; finding that service is appropriate on Maxim Health Care Services and S gt. Brawley and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the complaints, declaration, and summons without prepayment of fees, costs, or security therefor; granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery; and denying 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/29/2010. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Holiday et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holiday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?