Salter et al v. Onyx Corporation

Plaintiff: Ashley Salter, Debrah Mitchell, Amanda Barnett, Secillia Russell, Courtney Coleman and Elizabeth Ann Jundt
Defendant: Onyx Corporation
Case Number: 4:2010cv00906
Filed: July 13, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Joint Motion to Dismiss; each of the settlement agreements is approved, and this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/11/12. (vjt)
March 4, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part pltfs' 23 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/4/11. (vjt)
February 24, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying pltfs' 19 Motion for Collective Action under the FLSA. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/24/11. (vjt)
January 24, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information 17 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/24/11. (vjt)
January 6, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Dylan Potts, Drake Mann, Donna Galchus, Marsha Martin and Sheila Johnson to bring electronic devices to the courthouse for settlement conference on Friday, January 7, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. in accordance with General Order No. 54. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 1/6/11. (vjt)
December 29, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Plaintiff's Attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 12/29/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salter et al v. Onyx Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Salter
Represented By: Peter Drake Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debrah Mitchell
Represented By: Peter Drake Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Barnett
Represented By: Peter Drake Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secillia Russell
Represented By: Peter Drake Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Coleman
Represented By: Peter Drake Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ann Jundt
Represented By: Peter Drake Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onyx Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?