Garner et al v. Butterball LLC et al
Plaintiff: Roxie Garner, Roy Garner, Miguel Anguiano Araujo, Christopher Smith, John Snarr, James Rollins and Jason Foster
Defendant: Butterball LLC, Walter Pelletier, James Louis Maxwell, III, Keith Shoemaker, Jerry Godwin and Gary R Lenaghan
Case Number: 4:2010cv01025
Filed: July 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER OF FINAL APPROVAL AND FINAL JUDGMENT re the parties' 189 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of the Class and Collective Action Settlement, and pltfs' 190 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses; the Parties class- wide Settlement Agreement is fair and reasonable and is hereby approved; the pltfs' request for service payments of $6,000 for each of the named pltfs and $1,000 for each pltf who was deposed is approved; Class Counsel's re quest for attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $3,030,000 is reasonable and is approved; payment of attorneys' fees, costs and service payments shall be transmitted to Class Counsel as provided in the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/9/12. (vjt)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER that all pending motions are denied as moot 145 149 173 177 . Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/21/12. (vjt)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 170 Joint Motion Regarding Schedule for Disclosures Relating to Calculations of Potential Back Wages; the parties will report back to the Court with an agreed schedule on or before 6/29/12. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/18/12. (vjt)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER directing the Clerk to seal Document 161 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/23/12. (vjt)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting 155 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 8/1/2012; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 10/10/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/22/12. (vjt)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting 143 Motion for L. Dale Owens to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for defts in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/27/12. (vjt)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER that the 140 Joint Stipulation is hereby adopted as an Order of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/7/12. (vjt)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 OPINION AND ORDER granting pltfs' 108 Motion for Class Action Certification; both the defts' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 113 and the pltfs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 122 are DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/22/12. (vjt)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying as premature pltfs' 104 Motion to Compel Class Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/8/11. (vjt)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltfs' 74 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying defts' 76 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/27/11. (vjt)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER authorizing Kelly A. Swanson and T. Joseph Snodgrass to bring electronic devices into the courthouse in Little Rock on 6/22/11, subject to the provisions of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/15/11. (vjt)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER upon pltfs' 78 Notice Withdrawing their Rule 23 Certification Motion, pltfs' Motion for Class Certification 33 and defts' Motion to Stay the Motion for Class Certification 41 are both denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/8/11. (vjt)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 67 Motion for Angela Beranek Brandt to Appear pro hac vice as counsel for pltfs in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/20/11. (vjt)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that the parties' cross-motions for partial summary judgment 49 55 are hereby withdrawn. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/18/11. (vjt)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 MOTION for D. Christopher Lauderdale to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel for defts in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/12/11. (vjt)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting defts' 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer; Butterball LLC, Jerry Godwin, Gary R Lenaghan, James Louis Maxwell, III, Walter Pelletier, and Keith Shoemaker answer due 9/3/2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/3/10. (vjt)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Stephen X. Munger to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for defts in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/2/10. (vjt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner et al v. Butterball LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxie Garner
Represented By: Anne T. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Garner
Represented By: Anne T. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Anguiano Araujo
Represented By: Anne T. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Smith
Represented By: Anne T. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Snarr
Represented By: Anne T. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rollins
Represented By: Anne T. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Foster
Represented By: Anne T. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butterball LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Pelletier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Louis Maxwell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R Lenaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?