Rodgers v. Wynn et al

Plaintiff: Roger E Rodgers
Defendant: Allison Wynn, Vicki Norman and Baptist Health
Case Number: 4:2010cv01078
Filed: July 27, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 13 Order Dismissing Case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/16/10. (bkp)
August 31, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to submit the $350 filing fee on or before 9/15/10; failure to comply may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/31/10. (vjt)
August 6, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 8 Motion for Reconsideration re 5 Order denying Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/6/10. (vjt)
August 3, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pro se pltf to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; the Clerk is directed to serve this Order on pltf by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/3/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers v. Wynn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger E Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?