Brown v. Pollock et al

Plaintiff: Patrick Igwe Brown
Defendant: Jose Pollock and David Johnson
Case Number: 4:2010cv01102
Filed: August 3, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Ashley
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 100 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/18/12. (kpr)
April 24, 2012 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 91 Motion for Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/24/12. (kpr)
April 17, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Ashley County Defendants to ensure the attendance of inmate Kenneth Osburn at the April 24, 2012 Evidentiary Hearing; the Clerk is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the ADC Central Transportation/Medical Services, and to the Ashley County Jail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/17/12. (vjt)
April 5, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 75 Witness List filed by Patrick Igwe Brown. The ADC is directed to ensure the attendance of requested witnesses Glen Brown, ADC #116584 and Kenneth Osburn, ADC #079267, at the April 24, 2012 hearing. The Court will issue a subpoena for requested witness Torish Young, 403 W. Bowles, Dumas, AR 71639. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the subpoena without payment of fees therefor. The Court will not provide the $40 witness fee, and unless Plaintiff tenders the $40 witn ess fee, there is no authority to compel his witness to testify. The Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to the ADC Central Transportation/Medical Services, 7203 West 7th Street, Pine Bluff, AR 71603. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/5/12. (kpr)
February 22, 2012 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 75 Witness List filed by Patrick Igwe Brown. Three of the six witnesses will be permitted to testify. The Court will issue a subpoena for witness Torish Young, 403 W. Bowles, Dumas, AR 71639, at the March 7, 2012, hearing at 9:30 a.m., U .S. District Court, 600 W. Capitol Avenue, Courtroom 4B, Little Rock, AR 72201. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve this subpoena without payment of fees therefor. Plaintiff is directed to pay the $40 witness fee, or the witness will not be compelled to testify. The ADC is directed to ensure the attendance of requested witnesses, Glen Brown and Kenneth Osburn. The Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to the ADC Central Transportation/Medical Services, 7203 West 7th Street, Pine Bluff, AR 71603. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/22/12. (kpr)
February 17, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 75 Witness List filed by Patrick Igwe Brown. Plaintiff is directed to file a supplement to his witness list, within seven days of this Order, clariying when he was treated by Dr. Luwellen and including a summary of his expected testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/17/12. (kpr)
November 8, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER. The Order 68 dated November 7, 2011 is withdrawn. The Report and Recommendations is adopted and the motions for summary judgment filed by defts Slaughter and Flowers are granted in part, with respect to plaintiff's claims against them in their official capacities, and denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/8/11. (kpr)
November 7, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 59 Partial Report and Recommendations granting 54 57 Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Amy Slaughter, Flowers and dismissing defts Pollock and Johnson from plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff's allegations concerning the Jail grievance procedure and the lack of legal information are dismissed for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/7/11. (kpr)
October 20, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff a copy of the 59 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on the pending motions for summary judgment to his new address at 890 Freeline Drive, Pine Bluff, AR 71603. Plaintiff shall have up to and including November 2, 2011, to file any objections that he may have to the Magistrate Judge's report and recommendation. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/20/11. (kpr)
July 1, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 37 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/1/11. (kpr)
June 9, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to respond to defts' 37 MOTION to Compel within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/9/11. (vjt)
February 24, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to file a dispositive motion within 30 days of this Order, if they intend to rely on their answer to plaintiff's amended complaint 24 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/24/11. (kpr)
November 10, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 14 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, defts Pollock and Johnson are DISMISSED from pltf's complaint for failure to state a claim; pltf's allegations re the Ashley County Detention Facility grievance procedure and the lack of legal information are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim; David Johnson and Jose Pollock terminated. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/10/10. (vjt)
October 1, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for defts Amy Slaughter and Jailer Flowers and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint and summons on defts without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/1/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Pollock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Igwe Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?