Taylor v. Union Pacific Railroad

Plaintiff: Mike L Taylor
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad
Case Number: 4:2010cv01141
Filed: August 9, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 27 Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Union Pacific Railroad dismissing the complaint of Mike L Taylor with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/9/11. (vjt)
January 13, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing parties to file their Rule 26(f) Report by 1/24/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/13/11. (vjt)
August 23, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pro se pltf to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; the Clerk is directed to serve this Order on pltf by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/23/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Union Pacific Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike L Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?