Deen v. Clairday Food Service Enterprises

Plaintiff: Jerry Deen
Defendant: Clairday Food Service Enterprises
Case Number: 4:2010cv01160
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Jerry Deen against Clairday Food Service Enterprises re 69 Jury Verdict. The Plaintiff is awarded $29,000.00 in damages against Defendant Clairday Food Service Enterprises, Inc.. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/27/12. (kpr)
May 10, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion in Limine, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/10/12. (kpr)
September 16, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/16/11. (kpr)
August 10, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 22 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claim for retaliation under the FMLA is dismissed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/10/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deen v. Clairday Food Service Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Deen
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clairday Food Service Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?