Holmes v. Russell et al

Plaintiff: Shiela Holmes
Defendant: Michael Russell and Jerry Henry
Case Number: 4:2010cv01165
Filed: August 23, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2012 99 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 98 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/13/12. (vjt)
June 8, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion for Leave to File; denying 87 Motion for Reconsideration of 80 Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/8/12. (kpr)
October 26, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defts' motions to dismiss 31 46 ; defts' 19 motion for protective order is granted; pltf's motion to compel production of documents 37 is granted; pltf's motion for leave to file an amended complaint 48 is granted; the amended complaint is due within 5 days; defts' motion to quash 33 is denied as moot; a new trial date and scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/26/11. (vjt)
July 8, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the depositions of pltf and pltf's witnesses shall take place on any or all of the dates on which the parties state they are available. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/8/11. (vjt)
June 24, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 16 Motion to Quash; granting 18 Motion to Extend Time and extending the ddls for completing discovery and filing dispositive motions up to and including July 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/24/11. (kpr)
May 19, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 12 Motion to Quash Deposition Notices for May 20, 2011; defense counsel is ordered to confer with pltf's counsel as soon as possible for rescheduling the depositions. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/19/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiela Holmes
Represented By: Teresa L. Bloodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?