JMAR Express Inc et al v. Peterbilt of Memphis Inc et al

Plaintiff: JMAR Express Inc and CHRISTCAT Leasing Inc
Defendant: Peterbilt of Memphis Inc, PACCAR Inc, Caterpillar Inc, J A Riggs Tractor Company, Cummins Inc and Cummins Mid-South LLC
Case Number: 4:2010cv01231
Filed: September 10, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2013 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing the 2 Complaint with prejudice by reason of settlement. The Clerk forthwith serve copies of this Order upon the attorneys for the parties appearing in this action. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/16/2013. (dmn)
August 3, 2012 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 105 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice; denying 149 Motion for Summary Judgment and 167 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/3/12. (kpr)
July 31, 2012 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 149 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 172 Motion to Strike without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/31/12. (kpr)
February 14, 2012 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 108 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by J. Banks Sewell. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/14/12. (kpr)
January 24, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 99 Motion to Dismiss Cummins, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/24/12. (kpr)
November 2, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/2/11. (kpr)
March 7, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying deft Cummins Inc's 36 Motion to Sever Claims and for Separate Trials. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/7/11. (vjt)
February 22, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac viceof C.G. Norwood Jr. and Deirdre McGlinchey. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/22/11. (bkp)
February 14, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by J A Riggs Tractor Company; J A Riggs Tractor Company terminated. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/14/11. (vjt)
January 31, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER directing plaintiff's counsel to submit any legal citations to support her position by no later than Friday, February 4, 2011, by noon. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/31/11. (bkp)
October 12, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing plaintiffs' claims against Cummins Mid-South, LLC without prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/12/10. (bkp)
October 6, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Motions for J.A. Felton 19 and Kevin M. Kuhlman 20 to Appear Pro Hac Vice as additional counsel for defts Cummins Inc and Cummins Mid-South LLC. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/6/10. (vjt)
October 5, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cummins Mid-South LLC directing plaintiff to file any response by 5 p.m., Tuesday, October 12, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/5/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JMAR Express Inc et al v. Peterbilt of Memphis Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JMAR Express Inc
Represented By: John M. Belew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTCAT Leasing Inc
Represented By: John M. Belew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterbilt of Memphis Inc
Represented By: Michael J. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR Inc
Represented By: Michael J. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc
Represented By: M. Stephen Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J A Riggs Tractor Company
Represented By: Alexander Cale Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spillyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins Mid-South LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spillyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?