Emerson v. Taylor et al

Plaintiff: Edward L Emerson
Defendant: Taylor, Henderson and Tony Porter
Case Number: 4:2010cv01344
Filed: September 17, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 102 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/4/11. (vjt)
February 8, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/8/2011. (jct)
October 18, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 3 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against defts Henderson and Porter are DISMISSED without prejudice; pltf's 8 MOTION for Hearing is DENIED; Henderson and Tony Porter terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/18/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emerson v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward L Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?