Weatherford Artificial Lift Systems Inc v. Bruce Oakley Inc

Plaintiff: Weatherford Artificial Lift Systems Inc
Defendant: Bruce Oakley Inc
Case Number: 4:2010cv01364
Filed: September 20, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL pursuant to the 25 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by the parties in this matter, this cause of action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/10/11. (vjt)
February 2, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 parties request for extension of time within which to file their Rule 26(f) report. (Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/3/2011). Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/2/2011. (jct)
December 3, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 6 Motion to Intervene; granting 8 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim; granting 19 Motion to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/3/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weatherford Artificial Lift Systems Inc v. Bruce Oakley Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weatherford Artificial Lift Systems Inc
Represented By: Robert D. Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Oakley Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?