Fason v. Brown et al

Plaintiff: Todd Christopher Fason
Defendant: Bobby Brown, Garry Andrews, Garry Stewart and Ruth Bryant
Case Number: 4:2010cv01365
Filed: September 20, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to notify the Court, within ten days of the date of this Order, whether he has retained an attorney or whether he will continue prosecuting the case pro se. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/9/11. (kpr)
August 30, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the ADC to ensure pltf's attendance, along with his medical records and institutional file, at the hearing scheduled for 9/13/11 in Little Rock. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/30/11. (vjt)
February 7, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing deft Brown from this action, for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/7/11. (bkp)
November 24, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, amended complaint 6 , and this Order on defts Andrews, Stewart and Bryant without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/24/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fason v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Christopher Fason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?