Alsharki v. Dixson et al

Plaintiff: Hamis A-A-M Alsharki
Defendant: Barron Dixson, Ablondi, N Roe, Doc Holladay and Randy Morgan
Case Number: 4:2010cv01450
Filed: October 6, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf will be allowed to testify on his own behalf at the hearing; defts are directed to ensure the trial attendance of Debra Dillard and Charles Patillo, and to bring pltf's institutional and medical records to the trial; the ADC is directed to ensure the attendance of Michael Jackson, ADC #88412 at the trial scheduled for 5/23/11 at 11:00 a.m. in Little Rock. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 5/9/11. (vjt)
February 22, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against Barron Dickson without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/22/11. (bkp)
November 29, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Barron Dickson (originally sued as Barron Dixson); the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint 2 , and this Order on deft Dickson (ADDRESS FILED UNDER SEAL), without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/29/10. (vjt)
November 19, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct names of defts William Ablondi (originally sued as Ablondi) and Nathan Roe (originally sued as N. Roe). Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/19/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alsharki v. Dixson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamis A-A-M Alsharki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barron Dixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ablondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?