Culbertson v. Roberson et al

Plaintiff: Billy N Culbertson
Defendant: Jim Roberson, Samantha Cambell, Christine Munerlyn and Jane Baker
Case Number: 4:2010cv01464
Filed: October 12, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2012 137 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 136 Order dismissing the case with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/21/12. (kpr)
May 21, 2012 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 116 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/21/12. (kpr)
April 11, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 105 Motion to Compel and directing defts to submit responses to pltf's discovery requests within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/11/12. (kpr)
November 28, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Motion to Compel, which this Court construes as a Motion to Resume Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/28/11. (kpr)
July 29, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion to Clarify the Court's June 24, 2011 Partial Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/29/11. (kpr)
July 28, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 42 Witness List filed by Billy N Culbertson. The ADC is directed to ensure the attendance of Billy Culbertson, ADC # 076385, and inmate Anthony Mahoney, ADC #139513, at the August 9, 2011 hearing, together with a copy of pltf's medic al records and institutional file. Defts shall ensure the attendance of witnesses Ronnie Long, David Hankins, John Barta, Lt. Kerleasa, and Samantha Campbell at the August 9, 2011 hearing. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue subpoenas direc ting the appearance of Shirly Culbertson, Jackie Deuerling, and Dr. Richard Flanagan. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the subpoenas without pre-payment of fees therefor. The Clerk is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the ADC Central Transportation/Medical Services, 7203 West 7th Street, Pine Bluff, AR 71603. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/28/11. (kpr)
July 26, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 50 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 45 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/26/11. (vjt)
July 18, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 48 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/18/11. (kpr)
February 14, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for deft Christine Munnerlyn and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and complaint on deft, at 2820 Elton Parker Road, Carlisle, AR 72024, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/14/11. (bkp)
January 7, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. 19 Summons was Returned Unexecuted on deft Munnerlyn and the defts are directed to provide the last-known address for deft Munnerlyn within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/7/11. (bkp)
November 30, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Billy N Culbertson. The defts are directed to provide the last-known address of deft Munnerlyn within ten days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/30/10. (bkp)
November 29, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 5 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, deft Baker is DISMISSED from pltf's complaint for failure to state a claim; Baker terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/29/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culbertson v. Roberson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy N Culbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Cambell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Munerlyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?