Kinchen v. Pulaski County Sheriff Department

Plaintiff: Keith Kinchen
Defendant: Pulaski County Sheriff Department
Case Number: 4:2010cv01521
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2014 151 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 150 Order entered separately today, this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/29/2014. (ks)
June 3, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Due to the proximity of the trial date, the reference of pretrial matters to a United States Magistrate Judge is withdrawn. The undersigned will rule directly on the pending motion for summary judgment, as well as any other pretrial matters that may arise between now and trial. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/3/2014. (jak)
September 21, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 87 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, separate defts Phillips-Winter, Bryant, and Stewart's motion for summary judgment 82 is granted, and these defts are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/21/12. (vjt)
March 22, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 71 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions; Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/22/12. (vjt)
March 13, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 67 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's motion for default judgment 60 is DENIED; deft Evans's motion to dismiss 62 also is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/13/12. (vjt)
January 10, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 56 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, 53 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kenneth Cartwright and Alan Johnson is GRANTED; pltf's claims against these defts are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/10/12. (vjt)
December 6, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 9 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against defts Pulaski County, Pulaski County Sheriff Department, Mavin Kelley and City of Little Rock are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and these defts are dismissed as parties in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/6/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinchen v. Pulaski County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Kinchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?