Smith v. Dolgencorp LLC

Plaintiff: Betty J Smith
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC
Case Number: 4:2010cv01534
Filed: October 22, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 88 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/26/12. (kpr)
January 17, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 86 Jury Verdict in favor of the defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/17/12. (kpr)
January 5, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ruling on the parties' objections to deposition depositions and counter-designations. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/5/12. (kpr)
January 3, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Connie Grace, Gary Holt, Betty J. Smith, Joe Davis, Kyle Wilson, and Baxter Drennon to bring electronic devices into the courthouse on 1/4/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/3/12. (vjt)
December 20, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion to Exclude; denying 44 Motion to Exclude; finding as moot 53 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/20/11. (kpr)
July 26, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion to Compel; granting 11 Motion to Compel and directing that the examination by Dr. Peeples should be scheduled so that any report and supplemental disclosures can be made on or before August 15, 2011. The deposition of Dr. Peeples shall be scheduled on or before August 26, 2011; denying 27 Motion for Protective Order. The deposition of Dr. William Doss will take place as scheduled on July 29, 2011. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/26/11. (kpr)
June 7, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/7/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Dolgencorp LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty J Smith
Represented By: Connie L. Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC
Represented By: Kyle Ray Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?