Cundiff v. Patton et al

Plaintiff: Tyson Elvin Cundiff
Defendant: Michael Patton and Aaron Duvall
Case Number: 4:2010cv01542
Filed: October 27, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pope
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 34 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/1/11. (vjt)
July 13, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to respond to the 27 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to File Their Witness & Exhibits List and Other Deadlines filed by Michael Patton within 30 days of this Order. The August 11, 2011 Evidentiary Hearing is continued. The Clerk is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the ADC Central Transportation/Medical Services, 7203 West Third Street, Pine Bluff, AR 71603. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/13/11. (kpr)
January 20, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 11 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, Cundiff's claims against Sheriff Duvall are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/20/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cundiff v. Patton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyson Elvin Cundiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Duvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?