Indigo LR LLC et al v. Whitwell et al

Plaintiff: Indigo LR LLC and Chris Eakin
Defendant: Stephen Whitwell, Advanced Insurance Brokerage of America Inc, Matt Lile and Employers Choice Health Plan
Case Number: 4:2010cv01657
Filed: November 15, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2012 86 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 85 Order entered in this case, Indigo and Eakin's amended proposed-class complaint is dismissed without prejudice for lack of standing. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/8/2012. (dmn)
April 27, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 66 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 75 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing pltfs' claims against Stephen Whitwell, without prejudice; and granting 76 Motion for Order for leave to take Eugene Cauley's deposition. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/27/12. (kpr)
November 4, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/4/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indigo LR LLC et al v. Whitwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indigo LR LLC
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Eakin
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Whitwell
Represented By: James F. Swindoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Insurance Brokerage of America Inc
Represented By: John Carter Fairley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Lile
Represented By: Julia M. Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Choice Health Plan
Represented By: John Carter Fairley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?