Rowland v. Crothall Healthcare Inc et al

Plaintiff: Carolyn W Rowland
Defendant: Kimberly Evans, James Jordan, Crothall Healthcare Inc, Roy Haynes and Todd Richmond
Case Number: 4:2010cv01998
Filed: December 8, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing the case with prejudice pursuant to the 62 Stipulation of Dismissal filed, with each party to bear her or its own costs. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/18/12. (kpr)
October 23, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this case from the trial calendar for the week of January 14, 2013. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/23/12. (kpr)
September 10, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 50 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 52 Motion to Withdraw 49 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/10/12. (kpr)
October 17, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff's counsel to appear and file a Rule 26(f) report by October 29, 2011. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/17/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowland v. Crothall Healthcare Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crothall Healthcare Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn W Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?