Buckley v. University of Arkansas Board of Trustees

Plaintiff: Hilda Buckley
Defendant: University of Arkansas Board of Trustees
Case Number: 4:2010cv02009
Filed: December 10, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying deft's 67 Motion for Costs. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/28/12. (vjt)
February 9, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 63 Jury Verdict, judgment is hereby entered in favor of University of Arkansas Board of Trustees, dismissing the complaint of Hilda Buckley with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/9/12. (vjt)
January 20, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying deft's 27 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/20/12. (vjt)
April 15, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information 14 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/15/11. (vjt)
January 28, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part deft's 2 Motion to Dismiss; granted as to pltf's age discrimination claim and denied as to the civil rights claim. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/28/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckley v. University of Arkansas Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Buckley
Represented By: Shawn Garrick Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?