Duckworth v. AT&T Services Inc et al

Plaintiff: Ruben Duckworth
Defendant: AT&T Corporation, AT&T Services Inc and Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Case Number: 4:2010cv02033
Filed: December 21, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 29:825
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and directing the C lerk to close the case. The parties are to bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/18/12. (kpr)
June 7, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file a status report on the stipulation of dismissal or a stipulation of dismissal within seven days of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/7/12. (kpr)
January 13, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 32 Notice of Settlement. The jury trial scheduled for 2/21/12 and all remaining ddls are canceled, and all pending motion are moot. The parties are directed to file a Stipulation of Dismissal once the settlement agreement has been executed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/13/12. (kpr)
December 1, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Compel. The ddl for Rule 30(b)(6) depositions is extended up to, and including, December 22, 2011. The ddl for filing motions to dismiss or motions for summary judgment is extended up to, and including, January 5, 2012. Reply briefs are allowed for motions for summary judgment and those will be due on January 26, 2012. All other ddls remain the same.Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/1/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duckworth v. AT&T Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Duckworth
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?