Leaphart v. Williamson et al

Plaintiff: Catherine Leaphart
Defendant: Tyrone Williamson, Cliff Kirchner, Phillip Carruth, Freddie Harris, Bill Eaton, Robert Wiley, Kevin Freeman, Randal Crouch, Garland Steuber and Larry Holman
Case Number: 4:2010cv02035
Filed: December 21, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pope
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/22/14. (kpr)
January 8, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER based on the parties' representations to the Court that this matter has settled, the Court removes this case from the trial docket for the week of January 21, 2014. This matter will remain open until the parties file a motion to dismiss or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/8/2014. (jak)
May 8, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file a status report no later than May 20, 2013.. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/8/12. (kpr)
February 7, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that defts' 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; summary judgment is granted on all claims against Larry Holman, and he is dismissed from this action; summary judgment is granted on pltf's civil conspiracy claim and is denied in all other respects; Larry Holman terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/7/12. (vjt)
January 10, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 27 Motion for Dismissal of Tyrone Williamson without prejudice, in his individual capacity. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/10/12. (vjt)
November 2, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines; Discovery due by 11/24/2011; Dispositive Motions due by 12/9/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/2/11. (vjt)
January 19, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Phillip Carruth, Bill Eaton, Kevin Freeman, Freddie Harris, Larry Holman, Garland Steuber, Robert Wiley, and Tyrone Williamson answer due 1/31/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/19/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leaphart v. Williamson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Leaphart
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Represented By: Ashley R. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrone Williamson
Represented By: Matthew Keith Wren
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Kirchner
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Carruth
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freddie Harris
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Eaton
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wiley
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Freeman
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randal Crouch
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garland Steuber
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Holman
Represented By: John Lennon Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?