Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Crye-Leike Inc et al

Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Crye-Leike Inc and Crye-Leike of Arkansas Inc
Intervenor: Rosalind Brown, Lisa Martin, Kenya Ransom, Brandy Robinson, Vicki Holcomb and Stephanie Harvill
Case Number: 4:2010cv02070
Filed: December 30, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT DECREE, this Decree resolves all issues and claims arising out of the Commission's Complaint; deft will pay a total of $600,000 in full and final settlement of the individual and class claims in this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/17/12. (vjt)
January 5, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice defts' 53 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings; the parties are directed to immediately notify the Court if and when they reach a full resolution of this case or file a status report within 90 days. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/5/12. (vjt)
October 21, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY and returning this action to the active docket; the parties are directed to apprise the Court of the status of this case no later than 10/31/11. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/21/11. (vjt)
August 3, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 17 Crye-Leike's and the intervening plaintiffs' joint motion for summary judgment; and directing Cyre-Leike to apprise the Court within 14 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order whether it desires to return to conciliation or whether it deems conciliation complete and desires that the Court issue a Scheduling Order setting a trial date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/3/11. (hph)
June 13, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing EEOC to file their response to 17 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Failure to Conciliate in Good Faith within 14 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/13/11. (vjt)
April 1, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion of Rosalind Brown, Lisa Martin, Kenya Ransom, Brandy Robinson, Viki Holcomb, and Stephanie Harvill to Intervene as parties in this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/1/11. (vjt)
January 12, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Markeisha K. Savage to Appear pro hac vice as additional counsel of record for EEOC. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/12/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Crye-Leike Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Rosalind Brown
Represented By: Chris R. Carnahan
Represented By: Ted Joseph Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Lisa Martin
Represented By: Chris R. Carnahan
Represented By: Ted Joseph Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Kenya Ransom
Represented By: Chris R. Carnahan
Represented By: Ted Joseph Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Brandy Robinson
Represented By: Chris R. Carnahan
Represented By: Ted Joseph Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Vicki Holcomb
Represented By: Chris R. Carnahan
Represented By: Ted Joseph Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Stephanie Harvill
Represented By: Chris R. Carnahan
Represented By: Ted Joseph Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Faye A. Williams
Represented By: Kelley R. Thomas
Represented By: Deidre Smith
Represented By: Markeisha K. Savage
Represented By: Celia S. Liner
Represented By: Joseph M. Crout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crye-Leike Inc
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Heather W. Fletcher
Represented By: Richard H. Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crye-Leike of Arkansas Inc
Represented By: Richard H. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Heather W. Fletcher
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?