Foster v. Torling

Plaintiff: Charles E Foster, Jr
Defendant: B Torling
Case Number: 4:2011cv00002
Filed: January 3, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered into the record, the Plaintiff shall have Judgment over the Defendant in the amount of $250. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/13/2012. (srw)
November 2, 2012 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to issue a subpoena directing the appearance of witness Clarence Simons; directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the subpoena without payment of costs or fees therefore; directing the ADC to ensure the attendance of inmate Andre Allen, ADC #148743, and Plaintiff Charles E. Foster, Jr., ADC #147301, at the 11/13/2012 trial; and directing the Clerk of the Court to forward a copy of this Order to the ADC Central Transportation/Medical Services. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/2/2012. (srw)
March 6, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and dismissing plaintiff's allegations against deft in his official capacity. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/6/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Torling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E Foster, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Torling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?