Washington v. Byrd et al

Plaintiff: Willie Washington
Defendant: Karl Byrd, Bobby Brown, John Randall and Gary Andrews
Case Number: 4:2011cv00008
Filed: January 4, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 57 Memorandum and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of defts dismissing the complaint of Willie Washington with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/16/12. (vjt)
October 26, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendant shall file, on or before November 21, 2011, a Supplemental Brief in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment that contains the information specified in this Order; denying, as moot, docket entry # 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; and Plaintiff may file, on or before December 20, 2011, a Supplemental Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/26/2011. (kcs)
September 7, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that Plaintiff shall file within thirty days of the entry of the Order, a Response to docket entry # 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gary Andrews, Karl Byrd, John Randall, Bobby Brown and a Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the Fed. R. Civ. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions set forth in this Order. Failure to timely and propertly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts set forth in the Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(c); or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/07/2011. (kcs)
August 30, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendant shall provide the Clerk with redacted exhibits on or before September 2, 2011. The Clerk is directed to replace the exhibits attached to docket entry # 33 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) filed by Gary Andrews, Karl Byrd, John Randall, Bobby Brown, with the redacted exhibits provided by Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/30/2011. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Byrd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Byrd
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Brown
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Randall
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Andrews
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?