Lawrence v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Sheila Kay Lawrence
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2011cv00040
Filed: January 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Perry
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 26 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 22 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses is granted in the amount of $3,489.82. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/13/12. (vjt)
August 16, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 20 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, this case is hereby remanded for further proceedings; this a "sentence six" remand. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/16/11. (vjt) (copy of Order & Judgment forwarded to Office of Hearings & Appeals)
May 10, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief; Plaintiff Brief due by 6/15/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 5/10/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Represented By: James D. Sides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Kay Lawrence
Represented By: Kenneth Vincent Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?