Kerrigan et al v. Johnson & Johnson Inc et al

Plaintiff: Warren Kerrigan
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Inc, Ethicon Inc and John Does
Case Number: 4:2011cv00053
Filed: January 21, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Hot Spring
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/18/2012. (mcz)
August 16, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants must designate their experts by 8/27/12. Any rebuttal expert must be designated by 9/4/12. John Does I-X are dismissed without prejudice. This case is first-out for trial on 12/10/12. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/16/12. (kpr)
August 13, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reflecting Dr. Cashs supplemental affidavit clarifies the nadus issue. But Defendants have now made strong arguments about the weaknesses in the foundation of Dr. Cash's opinion on causation. If Kerrigan wishes to be heard on those issues, he should file a sur-reply by Wednesday, August 15th. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 08/13/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerrigan et al v. Johnson & Johnson Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Kerrigan
Represented By: Harold F. Cook, Jr.
Represented By: James R. Baber
Represented By: James Ralph Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Inc
Represented By: Catherine M. Corless
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Catherine M. Corless
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?