Miner v. Childs et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Scott Miner
Defendant: Micheal Givens and Demontrel Childs
Case Number: 4:2011cv00059
Filed: January 24, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Pursuant to the Memorandum and Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, DISMISSED without prejudice, for failure to prosecute. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/27/12. (hph)
February 22, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Thomas B. Staley to represent plaintiff Scott Miner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/22/12. (kpr)
January 23, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file an updated Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (enclosed) within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/23/12. (vjt)
January 10, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Motion to Compel as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/10/12. (kpr)
December 1, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 63 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/1/11. (kpr)
September 30, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion for Default Judgment, which is construed as a Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/30/11. (kpr)
March 2, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defts Porter and Byrd from plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/2/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miner v. Childs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Givens
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demontrel Childs
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Scott Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?