Terry et al v. B&T Transportation Inc et al

Plaintiff: Scott Terry, John Terry and Barbara Terry
Defendant: B&T Transportation Inc and Karen Baer
Counter_claimant: B&T Transportation Inc
Counter_defendant: Scott Terry
Case Number: 4:2011cv00070
Filed: January 28, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Consistent with the order entered today, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/13/2012. (hph)
May 25, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss Party. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/25/11. (kpr)
May 18, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion in part and denying it in part, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/18/11. (kpr) Modified on 5/18/2011 to correct typographical error (jct).
February 3, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to respond in writing to plaintiffs' 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Hearing by Monday, February 7, 2011. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/3/11. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry et al v. B&T Transportation Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: B&T Transportation Inc
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Scott Terry
Represented By: Joe Ryan Solomon
Represented By: Amanda K. Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Terry
Represented By: Amanda K. Wofford
Represented By: Joe Ryan Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Terry
Represented By: Amanda K. Wofford
Represented By: Joe Ryan Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Terry
Represented By: Amanda K. Wofford
Represented By: Joe Ryan Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&T Transportation Inc
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Baer
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?