B & H Construction Inc v. Burke

Plaintiff: B & H Construction Inc
Defendant: Jackie A Burke
Counter_claimant: Jackie A Burke
Counter_defendant: B & H Construction Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00075
Filed: February 1, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT that judgment be entered against B&H in favor of Burke in the amount of $12,000.00 upon the Counterclaim of Burke, plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.25% per annum. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/9/12. (vjt)
December 12, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 20 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; pltf's claims against deft are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and deft is granted summary judgment in his favor on his counterclaim to the extent that the Court finds, as a matter of law, that pltf breached the parties' employment agreement; trial will proceed on the issue damages. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/12/11. (vjt)
October 17, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Burke's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Count I and Count III of the Counterclaim without prejudice; Count II remains. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/17/11. (vjt)
March 29, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing attorney Christopher R. Warthen to, within 5 days of the entry of this Order, either comply with procedures under Local Rule 83.5 for admission to the bar of this Court or serve a copy of this Order upon B&H Construction Inc and mail proof of service to Chambers; failure to comply, B&H Construction must retain new counsel, who must enter a notice of appearance in this action on or before 4/15/11. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/29/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B & H Construction Inc v. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B & H Construction Inc
Represented By: Christopher Ray Warthen
Represented By: Paul A. Schmidt, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie A Burke
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Jackie A Burke
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: B & H Construction Inc
Represented By: Paul A. Schmidt, Sr.
Represented By: Christopher Ray Warthen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?