Smith v. Walley et al

Plaintiff: William Don Smith
Defendant: Timothy Walley and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv00079
Filed: February 3, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL that all claims in this action are hereby dismissed with prejudice upon settlement. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/26/12. (vjt)
January 3, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all deadlines in this action are hereby stayed pending the upcoming settlement conference. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/3/12. (vjt)
December 12, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 60 Motion to Seal his response; therefore, pltf's 55 Response to Defts' Motion for Summary Judgment shall be SEALED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/12/11. (vjt)
October 13, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 35 State Farm's Motion to Exclude evidence of its settlement with Fannie Burks; pltf's Motions to Compel 29 30 are granted as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/13/11. (vjt)
July 26, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/26/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Walley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Don Smith
Represented By: Johnson D. Ogles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Walley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: John E. Moore
Represented By: Beverly A. Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?